Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Luigi Buronzo del Signore

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1731BornVercelli
6 Oct 175423.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 178452.9AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
26 Sep 178452.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
10 Aug 179159.8SelectedBishop of Novara, Italy
26 Sep 179159.9ConfirmedBishop of Novara, Italy
2 Nov 179665.0SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
10 Mar 179765.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
24 Jul 179765.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
24 Jun 180573.7ResignedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
23 Oct 180675.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Luigi Buronzo del Signore:
Archbishop Carlo Luigi Buronzo del Signore (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93, and Page 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 395
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013