Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Monticelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1722BornBrindisi
17 Dec 174624.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 178259.8SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
16 Dec 178260.1ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
21 Dec 178260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
1791¹68.2DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Monticelli:
Bishop Giuseppe Monticelli (born , died 1791) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015