Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Arcaroli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vieste, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1731Born
8 May 175523.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177644.0AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
4 Feb 177644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
16 Dec 179159.9SelectedBishop of Vieste, Italy
26 Mar 179260.2ConfirmedBishop of Vieste, Italy
10 Nov 181785.8ResignedBishop of Vieste, Italy
26 Jun 181886.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
25 Jun 182694.5DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Arcaroli
Archbishop Domenico Arcaroli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVico

  • a priest for 71.1 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256, and Page 439
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018