Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Giordano

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1717³BornNapoli
23 Sep 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
8 May 177658.6SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
20 May 177658.7ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
28 May 177658.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
Feb 1789³71.4DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Giordano:
Bishop Gennaro Giordano (born ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013