Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Paolo Mandarani

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1728Born
18 Sep 175122.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 177344.4AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
16 May 177344.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
19 May 179667.5DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Mandarani
Bishop Francesco Paolo Mandarani (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVibo Valentia

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018