Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giampaolo Dolfin, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1736BornSebenico
3 Dec 175822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
27 Jun 177438.5AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
3 Jul 177438.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Jul 177741.6AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 May 181983.4DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giampaolo Dolfin:
Bishop Giampaolo Dolfin C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 121, and Page 158
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013