Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Capocchiani

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1713Born
23 Sep 174733.7Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
12 Mar 177460.2SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
18 Apr 177460.3ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
24 Apr 177460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Oct 178874.8DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Capocchiani
Bishop Giuseppe Capocchiani (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotrone

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018