Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Battista Rivelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1732BornVitolano
15 Mar 175523.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177846.9AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
20 Dec 177846.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
23 Dec 179564.0DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Battista Rivelli:
Archbishop Battista Rivelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013