Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pergamo

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1726Born
20 Dec 174923.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 177145.0SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
16 Dec 177145.1ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 Dec 177145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
26 Jun 178558.6DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pergamo
Bishop Carlo Pergamo (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,771, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast