Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino Muti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1732BornRoma, Italy
14 Apr 175926.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 177341.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
26 Sep 177341.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
2 Dec 177341.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
31 Aug 178149.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Muti (VIAF: 89244639)
Archbishop Bernardino Muti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 30
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016