Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Antonucci

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1726Born
4 Jun 175731.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177549.7AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
19 Nov 177549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
21 Mar 180478.1DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Antonucci
Bishop Gennaro Antonucci (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast