Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Antonio dall’Ostia

Deceased

Bishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1721Born
29 Sep 174625.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177150.8AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
21 Dec 177150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
26 Oct 179473.6DiedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Antonio dall’Ostia
Bishop Giovanni Maria Antonio dall’Ostia (born , died ) Bishop of Arbe (Rab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZadar

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018