Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Ivan (Antonio Giovanni Giuseppe) Luković (Lucovich)

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1729Born
23 Sep 175223.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 178455.3AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
30 Nov 178455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
2 Dec 179465.5DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Ivan (Antonio Giovanni Giuseppe) Luković (Lucovich) (VIAF: 305613216)
Bishop Antun Ivan (Antonio Giovanni Giuseppe) Luković (Lucovich) (born , died ) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrčanj, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceNovigrad, Diocese of Novigrad (Cittanova)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Novigrad, Diocese of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,784, Number 34
  • ob: AT, 22 Apr 2018
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,723

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast