Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vincenti

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1737BornLivorno
20 Dec 176023.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 177335.4AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
20 Jun 177335.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
Nov 180365.8DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vincenti:
Bishop Francesco Vincenti (born , died Nov 1803) Bishop of Pescia

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015