Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ranieri Mancini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1735Born
9 Jul 175822.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 177337.7AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
20 Jun 177337.7Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
15 Apr 177640.6AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
30 Apr 180973.6ResignedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
10 Feb 181478.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ranieri Mancini
Bishop Ranieri Mancini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172, and Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018