Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Benedetto Ganassoni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1734Born
30 Jan 175723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Dec 177339.9AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
21 Dec 177339.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
12 Jul 177945.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Feltre, Italy
29 Mar 178652.1DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Benedetto Ganassoni
Archbishop Andrea Benedetto Ganassoni O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182, and Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast