Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Labini, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1735BornBitonto
23 Sep 175823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
3 Jun 178045.0SelectedBishop of Malta
19 Jun 178045.1ConfirmedBishop of Malta
25 Jun 178045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
3 Mar 179761.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
30 Apr 180772.0DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Labini:
Archbishop Vincenzo Labini O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 284, and Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1780, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015