Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elia Antonio Alberini (Alberani), O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1812Born
13 Jun 183522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
16 Jun 185643.5AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
6 Jul 185643.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
23 Mar 186047.2AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
8 May 187663.4DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Elia Antonio Alberini (Alberani) (VIAF: 90084802)
Bishop Elia Antonio Alberini (Alberani) O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFusignano, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017