Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neale MacCabe, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1816Born
Aug 1845³29.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
17 Dec 186751.4AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
2 Feb 186851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
24 Jul 187054.0DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Neale MacCabe
Bishop Neale MacCabe C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrosdrum, Diocese of Meath
Ordained BishopIrish, Seminary, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,868, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast