Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Baldassare Medici, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1772BornBologna
29 Jun 179522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Dec 183260.3AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
Jan 1833³60.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
1 Oct 183361.1DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Baldassare Medici:
Bishop Mariano Baldassare Medici O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,924
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013