Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Targioni

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1807Born
18 Sep 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185749.8AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
23 Aug 185749.9Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
17 Apr 187365.5DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Targioni (VIAF: 89536094)
Bishop Giuseppe Targioni (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Fleurs, Cathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017