Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Paoletti

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1809Born
22 Dec 183223.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185747.9AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
23 Aug 185747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
23 Apr 189080.6DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Paoletti
Bishop Luigi Maria Paoletti (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Fleurs, Cathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017