Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovacchino Limberti

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1821BornPrato
1 Jun 184422.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185736.1AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
23 Aug 185736.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
27 Oct 187453.3DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovacchino Limberti:
Archbishop Giovacchino Limberti (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013