Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lucien-Louis-Joseph-Napoléon Cardinal Bonaparte

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1828BornRome
13 Dec 185729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Mar 186839.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186839.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
19 Sep 187950.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
19 Nov 189567.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

MicroData Summary for Lucien-Louis-Joseph-Napoléon Bonaparte:
Lucien-Louis-Joseph-Napoléon Cardinal Bonaparte (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 27.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49, and Page 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014