Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Dias Laranjeira

Deceased

Bishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1820Born
30 Apr 184323.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Mar 184424.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 186040.4SelectedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Sep 186040.6ConfirmedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Oct 186040.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Aug 188868.5DiedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Dias Laranjeira
Bishop Sebastião Dias Laranjeira (born , died ) Bishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Alto
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017