Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Antonelli

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1792Born
23 Sep 181522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
3 Aug 185764.6AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
23 Aug 185764.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
27 Sep 185966.8DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Antonelli
Bishop Gioacchino Antonelli (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaella, Diocese of Fiesole
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Fleurs, Cathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017