Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Positano, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1668³BornNapoli
4 Aug 168416.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Mar 169122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Nov 171749.5SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
22 Nov 171749.5ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
28 Nov 171749.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
22 Mar 172354.9SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
27 Sep 172355.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 Mar 173061.9DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Positano:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Positano O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015