Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselmo Filippo Pecci, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera

Titular Archbishop of Soteropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1868BornTramutola
13 Sep 189122.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 189627.3ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jun 190334.5AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
28 Jun 190334.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
18 Sep 190738.7AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
10 Apr 194576.3RetiredArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
10 Apr 194576.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Soteropolis
14 Feb 195081.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Filippo Pecci:
Archbishop Anselmo Filippo Pecci O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,502
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013