Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Bonazzi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1840BornNapoli
15 Aug 185918.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Dec 186323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Mar 189453.4AppointedAbbot of Santissima TrinitÓ di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
9 Jun 190261.7AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
11 Jun 190261.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
23 Apr 191574.5DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Bonazzi:
Archbishop Benedetto Bonazzi O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1902, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013