Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Tommasi

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1855Born
20 Dec 187924.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189741.6AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
25 Apr 189741.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
30 Sep 192166.1AppointedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy
20 Jan 192872.4AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
15 Aug 193681.0DiedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Tommasi
Archbishop Giulio Tommasi (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScanzano, Diocese of Marsi
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 55
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017