Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Urban VI

Bartolomeo Prignano

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1318BornNaples
21 Mar 136446.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
137759.0AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
8 Apr 137860.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Apr 137860.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
15 Oct 138971.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Prignano:
Holy Father Bartolomeo Prignano (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a pope for 11.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013