Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Lescrope

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1386AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 1386Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 1398AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 1405DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Lescrope:
Archbishop Richard Lescrope (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233, and Page 208
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 552
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 108
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013