Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop JŠnos Kanizsai

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1384AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Oct 1387AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
30 May 1418DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for JŠnos Kanizsai
Archbishop JŠnos Kanizsai (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast