Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan (Giovanni) de Espila (Spilla), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹BornDeva, Spain
19 Jan 161151.0AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
6 Feb 161151.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
20 Sep 161959.7DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan (Giovanni) de Espila (Spilla):
Archbishop Juan (Giovanni) de Espila (Spilla) O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 67
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 49, Number 270
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013