Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Governo

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1385¹AppointedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
8 Jul 1390AppointedArchbishop of Corinthus, Greece
15 Mar 1395AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
5 Mar 1403AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Calvi Risorta, Italy
1413¹DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Governo
Archbishop Stefano Governo (died 1413) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 368, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 70, and Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast