Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Parlati, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1707³BornNapoli
23 Sep 173023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
14 Mar 176153.6SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
6 Apr 176153.7ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
12 Apr 176153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Nov 176760.3SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 Dec 176760.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 Feb 177466.5DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Parlati:
Archbishop Carlo Parlati C.P.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1773
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013