Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Giovine

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1816Born
21 May 184225.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187154.8AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
12 Nov 187154.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
11 Sep 187962.7DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giovine
Archbishop Pietro Giovine (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarigliano
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,955
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017