Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Frescobaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1808Born
18 Dec 183022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Oct 183123.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187163.2AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
5 Nov 187163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
2 May 187465.7DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Frescobaldi (VIAF: 88922318)
Bishop Lorenzo Frescobaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCestello, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ dei Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017