Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Ammirante

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1820Born
23 Dec 184323.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187151.0AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
12 Nov 187151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
23 Oct 188160.9DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Ammirante (VIAF: 260176470)
Bishop Raffaele Ammirante (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,955
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017