Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo di Niquesa

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1816Born
24 Sep 184226.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187155.3AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
12 Nov 187155.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
26 Mar 187962.7DiedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo di Niquesa
Bishop Paolo di Niquesa (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,955
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017