Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vidal Marín Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1653³BornMora
9 Apr 167825.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 169441.5AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
19 Dec 169441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
10 Mar 170956.0DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vidal Marín Fernández:
Bishop Vidal Marín Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 354
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,769
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,409
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 236, Number 1,466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015