Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar de Mendoza y Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornMadrid
5 Oct 169947.7AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
22 Nov 169947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
4 Nov 172775.8DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar de Mendoza y Sandoval:
Bishop Baltasar de Mendoza y Sandoval (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 241, Number 1,495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015