Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Archinto

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1651BornMilano
18 Mar 168634.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
31 Mar 168634.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
9 Apr 168634.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
26 Nov 168938.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Dec 1689³38.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
24 Dec 169544.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Feb 1696³44.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
18 May 169948.0AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Nov 169948.5Elevated to Cardinal
Aug 1700³49.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
14 Mar 170149.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
9 Apr 171260.9DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Archinto (VIAF: 89065488)
Giuseppe Cardinal Archinto (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
  • a cardinal for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1699
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Oct 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 5
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016