Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Folch y Cardona, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1657³Born
3 Feb 170042.2AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Apr 170042.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
3 Jun 170042.5InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
21 Jul 172466.6DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Folch y Cardona (VIAF: 22993262)
Archbishop Antonio Folch y Cardona O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,628
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 19, Number 1
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,700, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast