Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Valero y Losa

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664²BornVillanueva de la Jara
7 Nov 170743.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
1 May 170844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
19 Feb 171551.1SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
18 Mar 171551.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
23 Apr 172056.3DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Valero y Losa:
Archbishop Francisco Valero y Losa (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 301, and Page 383
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,252
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013