Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerolamo Archinto

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1672BornMilano, Italy
28 Sep 171038.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Oct 171038.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
25 Jan 171138.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
28 Mar 171138.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
16 Dec 171240.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
Mar 1713³40.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
26 Nov 172048.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Jul 1721³49.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
1 Oct 172149.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Archinto (VIAF: 195272767)
Archbishop Gerolamo Archinto (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Poland

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370
  • b/c2+: CB, 19 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,579
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 3
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016