Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Arias y Porres, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1638BornAlaejos
3 Apr 170263.4AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
28 May 170263.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
18 May 171273.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Jan 171374.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Nov 171779.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Arias y Porres:
Cardinal Manuel Arias y Porres O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
  • a cardinal for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 22, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013