Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Ignacio Salazar Goiri, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1615Born
11 Jan 168367.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
21 Mar 168368.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
23 Sep 169277.6DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito Ignacio Salazar Goiri
Bishop Benito Ignacio Salazar Goiri O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaños de Río Tobía
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 223, Number 1,384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast