Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Bellido Guevara

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1654³BornGranada
15 May 171358.4SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Sep 171358.7ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
21 May 171459.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
1 Jan 171762.0DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Bellido Guevara:
Bishop Esteban Bellido Guevara (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 29, Number 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015