Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Palacios y Tenorio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1648BornValdemoro
8 Jun 169345.3AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 Sep 169345.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
31 Jul 170254.5ResignedBishop of Guadix, Spain
1711²62.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Palacios y Tenorio:
Bishop Pedro de Palacios y Tenorio O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guadix

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 214
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,060
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 235, Number 1,458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013